Sudhakaran Nair, Gopakumar (CPSO#: 85923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hosptial Of Eastern Onta
Department of Anesthesiology & Pain
401 Symth Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 6W4
Phone: 613-737-2431
Fax: 613-738-4815
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: G. Sudhakaran Nair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pillai ( CPSO# 108879)
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )

Business Address:
Kingston Health Science Centre
Department of Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
Victory 2 Room 3-2- 104-0
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2366

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GOPAKUMAR SUDHAKARAN NAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUDHAKARAN NAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 16 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014