Sue-A-Quan, Andrew Iain (CPSO#: 68167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6587
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW IAIN SUE-A-QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUE-A-QUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996