Sues-McKay, Heather Anne (CPSO#: 74301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chiasson Sues-McKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sues-McKay ( CPSO# 74301 )
Dr. P. Chiasson ( CPSO# 73595 )

Business Address:
201 - 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 742-6200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 23 May 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE SUES-MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUES-MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 1999 to 15 Oct 1999
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2000