Sugimoto, Akira Kyle (CPSO#: 62115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
L H S C - Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55646
Fax: (519) 685-8176
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Akira Sugimoto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sugimoto ( CPSO# 62115 )
Dr. J. Kirby ( CPSO# 62534 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKIRA KYLE SUGIMOTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUGIMOTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)