Suh, Daniel (CPSO#: 89899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Health Centre
2 Elgin Park Drive
Unit B
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Fax: (905) 852-3531
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Suh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Suh ( CPSO# 89899 )

Business Address:
Uxbridge Health Centre
Unit B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL SUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2008 to 05 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 05 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2010