Sujana Kumar, Vidya (CPSO#: 95325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: (416) 495-2420
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIDYA SUJANA KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUJANA KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2017 to 12 Apr 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016