Suke, Judith Hunt (CPSO#: 93397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Haliburton Hospital
P O Box 115
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judith Suke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Suke ( CPSO# 93397 )

Business Address:
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH HUNT SUKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013