Sukhi, Amrita Kaur (CPSO#: 95163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Nephrology Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue W.
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Phone: 9058133951
Fax: 9058133830
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Sukhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sukhi ( CPSO# 95163 )

Business Address:
Regional Nephrology Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-3951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMRITA KAUR SUKHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015