Sultan, Khaleel Hassan Sultan Hassan (CPSO#: 80665)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 May 2004 to 25 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jun 2004 to 16 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 17 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013