Suman, Shahina (CPSO#: 93476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
9229 Lyndon B Johnson Freeway
Dallas TX  75243
United States
Phone: 4697123904

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHINA SUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014