Sumar, Irram Saleh Mohamed (CPSO#: 95600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-254-5577
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sumar ( CPSO# 95600 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRRAM SALEH MOHAMED SUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013