Sun, Hao (CPSO#: 93769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mapleton Health Centre
11 Andrews Drive West
Drayton ON  N0G 1P0
Phone: 5196383088
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hao Sun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sun ( CPSO# 93769 )

Business Address:
Mapleton Health Centre
11 Andrews Drive West
Drayton ON  N0G 1P0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAO SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012