Sunbul, Hala Jaffer Faisal (CPSO#: 83285)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 21 Sep 2005
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2005 to 22 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 22 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 22 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010