Sundaram, Arun N E (CPSO#: 86530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
M1 202C; M wing, First floor
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4808
Fax: (416) 480-4481
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Division of Neurology
A 233
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. Ext. 89124
Fax: (416) 480-4833
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARUN N E SUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNDARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2008