Suneja, Sumeet Kaur (CPSO#: 76123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Kidney Wellness Centre
3 Conestoga Dr
Unit 101
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 497-0114
Fax: (905) 497-7114
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5431
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 34567
Fax: (905) 494-6643
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suneja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Suneja ( CPSO# 76123 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
100 - 3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 497-0114

Business Address:
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3665

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMEET KAUR SUNEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNEJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 11 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 09 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005