Suri, Megha (CPSO#: 88372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5959 Anderson Street
Whitby ON  L1M 2E9
Phone: (905) 655-3321 Ext. 242
Fax: (905) 655-8992
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Megha Suri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Suri ( CPSO# 88372 )

Business Address:
5959 Anderson Street
Whitby ON  L1M 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 655-3321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHA SURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2016