Surkont, Michael (CPSO#: 95164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Pain Clinic
3175 Rutherford Road Unit 23
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone: (905)761-1288
Fax: (905) 761-2088
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg Pain Clinic
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (905)761-1288
Fax: (226) 781 0256
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Hamilton Pain Clinic
847 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 3B4
Canada
Phone: (905) 581-5543
Fax: (905) 581-7406
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Canada
Phone: 647-329-1825
Fax: 416-314-4030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Surkont Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Surkont ( CPSO# 95164 )

Business Address:
Vaughan Pain Clinic
Unit 26
3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone Number: (905) 761-1288

Business Address:
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (647) 329-1825

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SURKONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURKONT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013