Suryanarayan, Deepa (CPSO#: 92674)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam

Education:Mysore University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 26 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 10 May 2010 to 30 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 14 Jan 2013 to 03 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 15 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017