Susini, Vincenzo Rocco (CPSO#: 97186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Nipissing General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone: (705) 753-3110
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Susini ( CPSO# 97186 )

Business Address:
West Nipissing General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Vincenzo  Rocco  Susini  may  practise  medicine  independently  in family
            medicine.