Sutandar, Kalam (CPSO#: 82623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
200 Elizabeth Street 8EN-220
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4454
Fax: (416) 340-4198
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kalam Sutandar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sutandar ( CPSO# 82623 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
8EN-220
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALAM SUTANDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTANDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011