Suzuki, Takefumi (CPSO#: 90374)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Keio Gijuku Daigaku Igakubu, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Apr 2009 to 12 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 May 2011