Svystonyuk, Oleksandr Ivanovich (CPSO#: 81355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Chernovzy Medical Institute, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 952-2885
Fax: (905) 952-2886
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Svystonyuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Svystonyuk ( CPSO# 81355 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 952-2885

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLEKSANDR IVANOVICH SVYSTONYUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SVYSTONYUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 16 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2006 to 28 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 23 Nov 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007