Swaminathan, Sunita (CPSO#: 88738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Rfe Gs 480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 14163403946
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sunita Swaminathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Swaminathan ( CPSO# 88738 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Emergency Department
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 300-8871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNITA SWAMINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011