Swan, Lorna (CPSO#: 77707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2018

Expiry Date:  06 Sep 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Congenital Cardiac Centre
Division of Cardiology
UHN Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340 4800 Ext. 6649
Fax: 416 340 5014
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2002 to 31 May 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 06 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Lorna Swan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Swan
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Swan no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Swan's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Swan's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 1, 2018, and currently has an
                  interim expiry date of September 6, 2021.  The expiry date of this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.