Swanson, Mark Alexander (CPSO#: 33403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Xray and Ultrasound Inc.
16 Obrien St, Suite G3
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 327-0744
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Radiology Now
Suite 301
45 Sheppard Ave E.
Toronto ON  M2N 5W9
Canada
Phone: 416-964-6776
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Swanson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Swanson ( CPSO# 33403 )

Business Address:
16 Obrien Street
Suite G3
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2V9
Phone Number: (905) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 21, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 2, 2017, Soldier's Memorial Hospital, Orilla notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, pursuant to s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Mark Alexander Swanson resigned his hospital privileges effective May 21, 2017, during an investigation by the hospital into allegations relating to the clarity and timeliness of Dr. Swanson's reporting of diagnostic imaging.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER SWANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWANSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)