Swedani, Albert (CPSO#: 95937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone: (613) 742-8182
Fax: (613) 742-0430
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Swedani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Swedani ( CPSO# 95937 )

Business Address:
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone Number: (613) 742-8182

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT SWEDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWEDANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2013