Sweeney, Brian Terence (CPSO#: 82147)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010