Sweeney, Clodagh Margaret (CPSO#: 79548)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 22 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2011