Sweet, Nicholas Allen (CPSO#: 91294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3155 Harvester Road
Suite 309
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: 289-337-1663
Fax: 289-337-4407
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Sweet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sweet ( CPSO# 91294 )

Business Address:
3155 Harvester Road
Suite 309
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (289) 337-1663

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ALLEN SWEET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWEET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2014