Swenson, Brigit Ann (CPSO#: 75000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unison Health & Community Services
Lawrence Heights Site
12 Flemington Rd.
Toronto ON  M6A 2N4
Phone: (416) 787-1661
Fax: (416) 787-3761
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hassle Free Clinic
2nd Floor
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIGIT ANN SWENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWENSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 27 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2003