Swett Cosentino, Jossie Mercedes (CPSO#: 91289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Catholic University of Santiago de Guaya, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
Division of General Surgery
333 Windermere Rd C8-114
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-663-3269
Fax: 519-663-3068
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSSIE MERCEDES SWETT COSENTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWETT COSENTINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 28 Dec 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016