Swica, Leszek Jan (CPSO#: 75516)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014