Swieca, Richard Oscar (CPSO#: 61655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
26 Silverbirch
Dollard Des Ormeaux QC  H9A 2L3
Phone: (514) 683-2928
Fax: (514) 684-0611
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C H R S
150 St Thomas
Valleyfield QC  J6T 6C1
Canada
Phone: (450) 371-9920 Ext. 2224
Fax: (450) 371-7454
County: 
Electoral District: 

1685 RUE FLEETWOOD
Laval QC  H7N 4B2
Canada
Phone: (514) 256-0007
Fax: (514) 256-4966
County: 
Electoral District: 

2180 rue Fleury est
montreal QC  H2B 1K3
Canada
Phone: (514) 384-2000 Ext. 3009
County: 
Electoral District: 

28 Rue Gale
Ormstown QC  J0S1K0
Canada
Phone: 4508292321 Ext. 3326
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD OSCAR SWIECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWIECA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1991