Swirsky, Karen Naomi (CPSO#: 86378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7426
Fax: (416) 867-7498
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Swirsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Swirsky ( CPSO# 86378 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN NAOMI SWIRSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWIRSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009