Switakowski, Peter Karol (CPSO#: 76230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth St.
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medcan Clinic
Ste 1500 150 York St
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.K. Switakowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Switakowski ( CPSO# 76230 )

Business Address:
Mecan Clinic
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
UHN Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3946

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER KAROL SWITAKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWITAKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006