Sy, Jennifer (CPSO#: 98100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
928 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1C6
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5059
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Sy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sy ( CPSO# 98100 )

Business Address:
928 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER SY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014