Sy, Richmond (CPSO#: 74150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 191
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73477
Fax: (613) 737-8699
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 29
1910 St Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: 613 6866656 Ext. 6
Fax: 613 2489009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McGregor-Shaw and Sy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHMOND SY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2000