Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 12, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gurcharan Singh Syan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 12, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Syan engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his cardiology and internal medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Syan entered into an Undertaking dated January 11, 2019, whereby he agreed to provide outpatient care only and to engage in professional education and medical record keeping and communication. The ICRC also delivered a caution in person.
Instead of completing outstanding aspects of the professional education, the ICRC has accepted that Dr. Syan voluntarily restrict his practice to interpreting and reporting diagnostic testing and that he engage in workplace monitoring for one year.
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: January 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)