Syed, Atyab Abbas Naqvi (CPSO#: 85241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
207 - 10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atyab Syed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Syed ( CPSO# 85241 )

Business Address:
207-10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (780) 937-6893

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATYAB ABBAS NAQVI SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2018