Syed, Ikramuddin (CPSO#: 90242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6N5
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Canada
Phone: (905) 451-9999
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IKRAMUDDIN SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 20 Jun 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Jun 2009 to 08 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Mar 2010 to 08 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012