Syed, Uzma (CPSO#: 79732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Department of Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7442
Fax: (416) 281-7384
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. U. Syed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Syed ( CPSO# 79732 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UZMA SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008