Sygal, Vitaly (CPSO#: 89223)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2018