Sylvester, Carly Lynn (CPSO#: 95859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: Hansen, Carly Lynn (used until: 27 Oct 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Ophthalmology and Vision Sciences
340 College Street
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 978-6294
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLY LYNN SYLVESTER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SYLVESTER is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SYLVESTER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SYLVESTER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SYLVESTER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SYLVESTER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SYLVESTER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019