Symington, Ian Ronald (CPSO#: 76238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Serpentine Street
Copper Cliff ON  P0M 1N0
Phone: (705) 682-0300
Fax: (705) 682-0303
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Symington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Symington ( CPSO# 76238 )

Business Address:
2 Serpentine Street
Copper Cliff ON  P0M 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 682-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN RONALD SYMINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYMINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004