Syslak, Paul Henrik (CPSO#: 82025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 56576
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2180 Steeles W.
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-7002
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

66 Avenue Rd. Suite #4
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 922-2868
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Syslak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Syslak ( CPSO# 82025 )

Business Address:
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (905) 761-7002

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6576

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Apr 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Apr 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  April  29,  2011,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration  held  by Dr. Paul Henrik Syslak,
            in  accordance  with  an undertaking and consent given by  Dr.  Syslak  to  the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Paul Henrik Syslak  has  voluntarily  relinquished  his  prescribing
                  privileges   with   respect   to  the  following  drugs,  substances  and
                  preparations set out in the corresponding  regulations,  as  amended from
                  time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X