Szabla, Aleksandra (CPSO#: 92138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (905) 251-1580
Fax: (416) 915-6156
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
Ajax/Pickering Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health
Oshawa
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aleksandra Szabla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Szabla ( CPSO# 92138 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA SZABLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZABLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Dec 2009 to 04 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2010 to 04 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2011 to 06 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012