Szerb, Jennifer Jane (CPSO#: 78680)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2002 to 17 Dec 2002
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004