Szeto, Isabella Wing-Yuk (CPSO#: 76120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Emergency Department
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Isabella Szeto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Szeto ( CPSO# 76120 )

Business Address:
Biopharma Services
4000 Weston Road
North York ON  M9L 3A2
Phone Number: (416) 747-8484

Business Address:
Headwater Health Care Centre
Emergency Department
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISABELLA WING-YUK SZETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZETO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003