Szeto, Michael Warren (CPSO#: 92372)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Jan 2010 to 07 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2010