Szeto, Michael (CPSO#: 76372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Deparment Of Anaesthesiology
Room CCW 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Law Szeto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Law ( CPSO# 84068 )
Dr. M. Szeto ( CPSO# 76372 )

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room CCW - 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room CCW 1683
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SZETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZETO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006